AL HB535 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Checks, deferred presentment, regulation by Banking Dept., renewals, repayment plans further authorized, licensees to notify customer of installment loans, Secs. 5-18A-2, 5-18A-3, 5-18A-12, 5-18A-13 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Checks, deferred presentment, regulation by Banking Dept., renewals, repayment plans further authorized, licensees to notify customer of installment loans, Secs. 5-18A-2, 5-18A-3, 5-18A-12, 5-18A-13 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Garrett motion to Table (Y: 43 N: 31 NV: 3 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateFurther Consideration
2017-05-19SenateWhatley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-05-17SenateWhatley motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-17SenateBanking and Insurance Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2017-05-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 804
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-05-04HouseGarrett motion to Table adopted Roll Call 803
2017-05-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
2017-05-04HouseRowe Amendment Offered
2017-05-04HouseEngrossed
2017-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 802
2017-05-04HouseFincher Amendment Offered
2017-05-04HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 801
2017-05-04HouseFinancial Services Amendment Offered
2017-05-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-05-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB535&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB535-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB535-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186214-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186547-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186560-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186572-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574553&VOTE=801&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574556&VOTE=802&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574558&VOTE=803&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=574559&VOTE=804&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback