AL HB53 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Franklin County, further provides for the compensation and office of the coroner
Title
Franklin County, further provides for the compensation and office of the coroner
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Kiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 40 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-02-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 51 |
2024-02-21 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-20 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled |