AL HB529 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Florence, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales for off-premises consumption, authorized, Sec. 45-39A-10 am'd.
Title
Florence, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales for off-premises consumption, authorized, Sec. 45-39A-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 84 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 84 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 17, 2017 at 5:13 p.m. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-425. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1109 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 734 |
2017-05-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |