AL HB529 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 9:03 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Governor at 9:03 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defamation, showing of actual malice required, Sec. 13A-11-163 am'd.
Title
Defamation, showing of actual malice required, Sec. 13A-11-163 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 9:03 p.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-371. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 990 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2016-04-27 | House | McCutcheon intended to vote "Yea" |
2016-04-26 | House | Engrossed |
2016-04-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 738 |
2016-04-26 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 737 |
2016-04-26 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2016-04-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2016-04-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |