AL HB529 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alabama Veterinary Medical Association for the Spay-Neuter Program, income tax refund check-off for voluntary contribution to, duties to Revenue Department
Title
Alabama Veterinary Medical Association for the Spay-Neuter Program, income tax refund check-off for voluntary contribution to, duties to Revenue Department
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Governmental Affairs | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 605 | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 604 | |
2010-03-11 | Education Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-02-09 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Appropriations |