AL HB528 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Mobile Co., co. commission authorize to exempt intermittent food service establishment from regulation by co. health dept. in association with regional celebration or tradition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile Co., co. commission authorize to exempt intermittent food service establishment from regulation by co. health dept. in association with regional celebration or tradition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Wilcox motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Figures motion to Adopt (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 65 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - Wilcox motion to Table (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-385.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseWilcox motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1009
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1137
2017-05-17SenateFigures motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1136
2017-05-17SenateFigures first Substitute Offered
2017-05-17SenateFigures motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-17SenateLocal Legislation, Mobile County Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-05-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Mobile County
2017-05-03HouseEngrossed
2017-05-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 732
2017-05-03HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 731
2017-05-03HouseWilcox first Substitute Offered
2017-05-03HouseWilcox motion to Table adopted Roll Call 730
2017-05-03HouseMobile County Legislation Amendment Offered
2017-05-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB528&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB528-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB528-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186080-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186444-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186777-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/186941-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=573846&VOTE=730&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=573854&VOTE=731&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=573855&VOTE=732&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577295&VOTE=1136&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577296&VOTE=1137&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578796&VOTE=1009&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback