AL HB527 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:49 p.m. on March 11.2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:49 p.m. on March 11.2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sumter Co., hazardous waste sites, solid waste fees, redistributions, Act 83-480, 1983 Reg. Sess., am'd.; Act 90-612, 1990 Reg. Sess., repealed
Title
Sumter Co., hazardous waste sites, solid waste fees, redistributions, Act 83-480, 1983 Reg. Sess., am'd.; Act 90-612, 1990 Reg. Sess., repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - McCampbell motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 4:49 p.m. on March 11.2014. |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-174. |
2014-03-11 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-03-11 | House | McCampbell motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 666 |
2014-03-11 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read Again a Third Time and Pass as Amended adopted Roll Call 741 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 740 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Singleton motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 719 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 718 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2014-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 461 |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |