AL HB524 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Campaign contributions, date when received, clarified, Sec. 17-5-2 am'd.
Title
Campaign contributions, date when received, clarified, Sec. 17-5-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Barry Moore [R] | Rep. Paul Beckman [R] | Rep. Juandalynn Givan [D] |
Rep. Richard Lindsey [D] | Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections |
2014-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 886 |
2014-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 885 |
2014-03-19 | House | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 884 |
2014-03-19 | House | Ethics and Campaign Finance first Substitute Offered |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2014-02-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance |