AL HB523 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Colbert Co., churches, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others, const. amend.
Title
Colbert Co., churches, deadly physical force, use in self-defense or defense of others, const. amend.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2019-05-09 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 606 |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 605 |
2019-05-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 604 |
2019-05-09 | House | Local Legislation Amendment Offered |
2019-05-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2019-04-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |