AL HB521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Russell Co, courts, domestic violence cases, additional court costs authorized to operate domestic violence shelter
Title
Russell Co, courts, domestic violence cases, additional court costs authorized to operate domestic violence shelter
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 78 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Recommit (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-22 - House - Motion to Recommit (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 62 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 25 Favorable from Local Legislation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 986 |
2018-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |