AL HB521 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Forwarded to Governor on May 11, 2017 at 1:12 p.m. on May 11, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Forwarded to Governor on May 11, 2017 at 1:12 p.m. on May 11, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Macon Co., revenue commissioner and judge of probate, certain duties regarding ad valorem tax collection on motor vehicles and real property, transferred between offices
Title
Macon Co., revenue commissioner and judge of probate, certain duties regarding ad valorem tax collection on motor vehicles and real property, transferred between offices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 72 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 11, 2017 at 1:12 p.m. on May 11, 2017. |
2017-05-11 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-331. |
2017-05-11 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1020 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 769 |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |