AL HB521 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tallassee Fire District, fire protection service fees, levy, expenditure for fire protection and local volunteer fire dept., referendum in City of Tallassee fire district
Title
Tallassee Fire District, fire protection service fees, levy, expenditure for fire protection and local volunteer fire dept., referendum in City of Tallassee fire district
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-369. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1018 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 683 |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |