AL HB52 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure, probation revocation, judge auhtorized to use discretion in the length of sentence a defendant must serve if revoked
Title
Criminal procedure, probation revocation, judge auhtorized to use discretion in the length of sentence a defendant must serve if revoked
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1026 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 221 (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 220 (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 219 (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 221 (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 220 (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 219 (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-381. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1026 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-16 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 221 |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 220 |
2022-02-16 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |