AL HB52 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing Home Administrators, Board of Examiners of, sunset law review, continued until Oct 1, 2025.
Title
Nursing Home Administrators, Board of Examiners of, sunset law review, continued until Oct 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 405 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 404 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 164 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 163 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 404 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 164 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 163 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:29 p.m. on March 4, 2021. |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-60. |
2021-03-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 405 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 164 |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |