AL HB52 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, tax exemption for Class 1-5 municipalities cultural districts
Title
Taxation, tax exemption for Class 1-5 municipalities cultural districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2014-03-11 | House | Engrossed |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 671 |
2014-03-11 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 670 |
2014-03-11 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |