AL HB52 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish, yellow perch raised in farm ponds, excluded from sale prohibition, Sec. 9-11-84 am'd.
Title
Game and fish, yellow perch raised in farm ponds, excluded from sale prohibition, Sec. 9-11-84 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Wes Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry | |
2011-03-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 132 | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |