AL HB52 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-11 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trapping of fur-bearing animals, licensing, use of plastic tags on traps and the requirement that the license number of the owner of a trap be contained on any tag, deleted, Sec. 9-11-59 am'd.
Title
Trapping of fur-bearing animals, licensing, use of plastic tags on traps and the requirement that the license number of the owner of a trap be contained on any tag, deleted, Sec. 9-11-59 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 234 | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |