AL HB519 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:19 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 10:19 p.m. on May 17, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
All-terrain vehicles and recreational off-highway vehicles, registration authorized on voluntary basis with ALEA, fees, deposit in off-road vehicle account
Title
All-terrain vehicles and recreational off-highway vehicles, registration authorized on voluntary basis with ALEA, fees, deposit in off-road vehicle account
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:19 p.m. on May 17, 2017. |
2017-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-395. |
2017-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1229 |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2017-05-04 | House | Engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 829 |
2017-05-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 828 |
2017-05-04 | House | Ainsworth first Substitute Offered |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-27 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-18 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |