AL HB517 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 3:46 p.m. on May 28, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Delivered to Governor at 3:46 p.m. on May 28, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electricity utility services, electric supplers, right to connect to transmission facilities, to remove sunset provision from Energy Security Act of 2015, Sec. 37-4-150 am'd.
Title
Electricity utility services, electric supplers, right to connect to transmission facilities, to remove sunset provision from Energy Security Act of 2015, Sec. 37-4-150 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:46 p.m. on May 28, 2019. |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-356. |
2019-05-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-23 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1146 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 750 |
2019-05-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |