AL HB515 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Jefferson County Legislation first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Jefferson County Legislation first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Jefferson Co., Birmingham, mayor-council form of government, mayor, council, powers and duties, further provided for, council members prohibited from serving on other city boards, Secs. 45-37A-52.55, 45-37A-52.56, 45-37A-52.59, 45-37A-52.95, 45-37A-52.128, 45-37A-52.134, 45-37A-52.198, 45-37A-52.200, 45-37A-52.221, 45-37A-52.270 am'd.
Title
Jefferson Co., Birmingham, mayor-council form of government, mayor, council, powers and duties, further provided for, council members prohibited from serving on other city boards, Secs. 45-37A-52.55, 45-37A-52.56, 45-37A-52.59, 45-37A-52.95, 45-37A-52.128, 45-37A-52.134, 45-37A-52.198, 45-37A-52.200, 45-37A-52.221, 45-37A-52.270 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - Robinson motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 75 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 31 Abs: 64) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - Robinson motion to Table (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 27 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 31 Abs: 64) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - Robinson motion to Table (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 27 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Jefferson County Legislation first Amendment Offered |
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:49 p.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-277. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Givan intended to vote "Yea" |
2016-05-04 | House | Robinson motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 877 |
2016-05-04 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 992 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 991 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Local Legislation, Jefferson County first Substitute Offered |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Jefferson County |
2016-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 691 |
2016-04-20 | House | Robinson motion to Table adopted Roll Call 690 |
2016-04-20 | House | Jefferson County Legislation Amendment Offered |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation |