AL HB514 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., board of registrars, co. salary supp, Sec. 45-2-110 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., board of registrars, co. salary supp, Sec. 45-2-110 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Albritton motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - House - Shiver motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 24) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:00 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-408.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HouseSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2017-05-19SenateAlbritton motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1318
2017-05-19SenateHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2017-05-19HouseShiver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1021
2017-05-19HouseExecutive Amendment Offered
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor on May 16, 2017 at 5:15 p.m.
2017-05-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-16HouseEnrolled
2017-05-16SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-16HousePassed Second House
2017-05-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1086
2017-05-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 571
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback