AL HB513 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health Department, licensure for care or treatment for mental or emotional illness or intellectual disability, licensed professional counselor and a church or ministry providing religious services excepted, mental illness and substance abuse treatment defined, Secs. 22-50-1, 22-50-17 am'd. (2011-20665)
Title
Mental Health Department, licensure for care or treatment for mental or emotional illness or intellectual disability, licensed professional counselor and a church or ministry providing religious services excepted, mental illness and substance abuse treatment defined, Secs. 22-50-1, 22-50-17 am'd. (2011-20665)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Delivered to Governor at 5:10 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-582. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 964 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 679 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 678 | |
2011-05-05 | Health first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |