AL HB512 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin Co., Law Library and Judicial Administration Fund, court costs collected for operation, further authorized, Sec. 45-2-80.87 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin Co., Law Library and Judicial Administration Fund, court costs collected for operation, further authorized, Sec. 45-2-80.87 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 71 Abs: 21) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor at 11:54 a.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-407.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseMcMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1006
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1082
2017-05-16SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1081
2017-05-16SenateLocal Legislation Amendment Offered
2017-05-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 594
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-04-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback