AL HB51 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Animals, abuse, torture and cruelty defined, reporting requirements, penalties (2012-20495)
Title
Animals, abuse, torture and cruelty defined, reporting requirements, penalties (2012-20495)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to table Ross motion to recommit (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Orr motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Judiciary first Amendment Offered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to table Ross motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 840 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ross motion to recommit |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Orr motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 684 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Standridge inadvertently voted "Nay" and intended to vote "Yea" |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 845 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 844 |
2013-04-25 | House | Agriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 843 |
2013-04-25 | House | Agriculture and Forestry first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |