AL HB509 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coosa Co., probate court, add'l fee for marriage license and petition for adoption, distrib.
Title
Coosa Co., probate court, add'l fee for marriage license and petition for adoption, distrib.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Tuggle [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1115 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 892 |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |