AL HB509 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Historic structures, Historical Commission, approval of tax credits for restoration further provided for, transfer of credits, amount of total credits, Act 2013-241, 2013 Reg. Sess, am'd.; Secs. 40-9F-3, 40-9F-4, 40-9F-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historic structures, Historical Commission, approval of tax credits for restoration further provided for, transfer of credits, amount of total credits, Act 2013-241, 2013 Reg. Sess, am'd.; Secs. 40-9F-3, 40-9F-4, 40-9F-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-03 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03HouseForwarded to Executive Department
2014-04-03HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-452.
2014-04-03HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-03SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-03HouseEnrolled
2014-04-03SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2014-04-03HouseDeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1120
2014-04-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2014-04-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1169
2014-04-03SenatePittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1168
2014-04-03SenatePittman Amendment Offered
2014-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-04-02SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-03-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2014-03-19HouseEngrossed
2014-03-19HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 878
2014-03-19HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 877
2014-03-19HouseDeMarco first Substitute Offered
2014-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-03-13HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-18HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB509
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB509-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB509-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2014RS/PrintFiles/HB509-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=496194&VOTE=877&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=496196&VOTE=878&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500281&VOTE=1168&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500282&VOTE=1169&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=500856&VOTE=1120&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1062&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback