AL HB509 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Russell Co., revenue commissioner, expense allowance, compensation, payment of expense allowance prorated
Title
Russell Co., revenue commissioner, expense allowance, compensation, payment of expense allowance prorated
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 42 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-304. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1142 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 475 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |