AL HB507 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-21 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marengo Co., probate office, co. commission authorize to provide mail fee
Title
Marengo Co., probate office, co. commission authorize to provide mail fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 679 |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-13 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |