AL HB506 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-09 - Referred to Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Jackson Co., human sewage biosolids, application to land as fertilizer or soil amendment, prohibited, exception, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jackson Co., human sewage biosolids, application to land as fertilizer or soil amendment, prohibited, exception, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Local Application (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2020-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 31) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-09SenateReferred to Committee
2020-05-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2020-05-08HouseJones (M) motion to Suspend Rules adopted Voice Vote
2020-05-08HouseMotion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 546
2020-05-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 545
2020-05-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-05-07HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-06HouseRereferred from Calendar to A&F
2020-05-06HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-05-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback