AL HB506 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 7:00 p.m. on May 9, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 7:00 p.m. on May 9, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public education employees, salary increase, including K-12 and certain other designated education institutions, liability insurance program to be established by Finance Department in consultation with Education Department
Title
Public education employees, salary increase, including K-12 and certain other designated education institutions, liability insurance program to be established by Finance Department in consultation with Education Department
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - Love motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Sanders motion to Adopt (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Pittman motion to Table (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Love motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 9, 2013 at 7:00 p.m. on May 9, 2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-215. |
2013-05-09 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-09 | House | Bandy, Burdine, Boyd, Colston, England, Grimsley and Melton inadvertently voted "Nay" and intended to vote "Yea" |
2013-05-09 | House | Love motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1195 |
2013-05-09 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 873 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 872 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 871 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pittman Amendment Offered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Sanders motion to Adopt lost Roll Call 870 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pittman motion to Table lost Roll Call 869 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Sanders Amendment Offered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pittman motion to Table adopted Voice Vote |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education first Substitute Offered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2013-04-10 | House | Chesteen abstained from voting due to a conflict of interest |
2013-04-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 380 |
2013-04-10 | House | Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 379 |
2013-04-10 | House | Holmes Amendment Offered |
2013-04-10 | House | Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 378 |
2013-04-10 | House | Hubbard (J) Amendment Offered |
2013-04-10 | House | Love motion to Table adopted Roll Call 377 |
2013-04-10 | House | Lindsey Amendment Offered |
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |