AL HB504 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chambers Co., outside of Valley and Lanett, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, referendum
Title
Chambers Co., outside of Valley and Lanett, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-20 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 27, 2018 at 6:09 p.m. on March 27, 2018. |
2018-03-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-566. |
2018-03-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1177 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-03-20 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 890 |
2018-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |