AL HB503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Community development districts, add'l type provided for if located on a lake in a wet county meeting certain other conditions. Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Title
Community development districts, add'l type provided for if located on a lake in a wet county meeting certain other conditions. Secs. 35-8B-1, 35-8B-2, 35-8B-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Pending third reading on day 21 Favorable from Economic Development and Tourism |
2018-03-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |