AL HB503 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fayette Co., county commission, judge of probate, membership, duties, and compensation further provided for, Secs. 45-29-71.02, 45-29-71.03, 45-29-71.04, 45-29-83 am'd.
Title
Fayette Co., county commission, judge of probate, membership, duties, and compensation further provided for, Secs. 45-29-71.02, 45-29-71.03, 45-29-71.04, 45-29-83 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 66 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2016-04-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 66 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016. |
2016-04-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-252 on 05/03/2016. |
2016-04-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 833 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2016-04-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 591 |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-12 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |