AL HB502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lamar Co., co. superintendent of education, to provide further for the compensation and expense allowance for, Sec. 45-38-101 am'd.
Title
Lamar Co., co. superintendent of education, to provide further for the compensation and expense allowance for, Sec. 45-38-101 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 31 Abs: 35) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2020-05-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 400 |
2020-05-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-05-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |