AL HB502 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Forever Wild Land Trust, ad valorem tax revenue lost on property acquired, reimbursement payments from trust to all entities previously receiving tax revenue, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forever Wild Land Trust, ad valorem tax revenue lost on property acquired, reimbursement payments from trust to all entities previously receiving tax revenue, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Ward motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseIndefinitely Postponed
2017-04-27HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback