AL HB502 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-28 - Delivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Fayette Co., Water Coordinating and Fire Prevention Authority, board of directors, members further provided for, competitive bid laws, exemption deleted, Secs. 45-29-140.04, 45-29-140.06 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fayette Co., Water Coordinating and Fire Prevention Authority, board of directors, members further provided for, competitive bid laws, exemption deleted, Secs. 45-29-140.04, 45-29-140.06 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-27 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 23) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-28HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:54 a.m. on April 28, 2016.
2016-04-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-251.
2016-04-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-04-28SenateSignature Requested
2016-04-27HouseEnrolled
2016-04-27HousePassed Second House
2016-04-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 832
2016-04-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-19SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2016-04-13HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 593
2016-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-04-12HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback