AL HB500 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Madison Co., coroner, compensation, Sec. 45-45-60 repealed and superseded
Title
Madison Co., coroner, compensation, Sec. 45-45-60 repealed and superseded
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Whitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1000 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 798 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 797 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 798 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 67 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Whitt motion to Adopt Roll Call 797 (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-405. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Madison County Legislation |
2022-03-31 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 798 |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Madison County Legislation |