AL HB500 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Litter, increase penalties, new penalties for litter from vehicle or watercraft, litter further defined, and penalty increased from Class C to Class B misdemeanor, Secs. 13A-7-29, 23-5-6, 32-5-76, 32-5A-60, 33-6-10 am'd.
Title
Litter, increase penalties, new penalties for litter from vehicle or watercraft, litter further defined, and penalty increased from Class C to Class B misdemeanor, Secs. 13A-7-29, 23-5-6, 32-5-76, 32-5A-60, 33-6-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-530. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1483 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy |
2019-05-23 | House | Engrossed |
2019-05-23 | House | Eaterbrook intended to vote "Yea" |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1027 |
2019-05-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1026 |
2019-05-23 | House | Wilcox Amendment Offered |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |