AL HB50 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Law enforcement, allegations of excessive force, Ala. Criminal Justice Information System to collect data on, reports to legislative committees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement, allegations of excessive force, Ala. Criminal Justice Information System to collect data on, reports to legislative committees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseEngrossed
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:19 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-399.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HousePassed Second House
2017-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1294
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-09SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-18SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2017-04-18HouseEngrossed
2017-04-18HouseMooney intended to vote "Yea"
2017-04-18HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 549
2017-04-18HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 548
2017-04-18HouseBoyd first Substitute Offered
2017-04-18HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB50&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB50-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB50-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184843-3.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569697&VOTE=548&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=569702&VOTE=549&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=579051&VOTE=1294&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback