AL HB5 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:51 p.m. on October 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-01 - Delivered to Governor at 2:51 p.m. on October 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Corrections Department, correctional Capital Improvement Fund, appropriation of $400,000,000 from federal funds, American Rescue Act, for fiscal year ending September 30, 2022
Title
Corrections Department, correctional Capital Improvement Fund, appropriation of $400,000,000 from federal funds, American Rescue Act, for fiscal year ending September 30, 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-10-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 17 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 6 (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 5 (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 6 (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - Ledbetter motion to Previous Question Roll Call 5 (Y: 75 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:51 p.m. on October 1, 2021. |
2021-10-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-547. |
2021-10-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-10-01 | House | Enrolled |
2021-10-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 17 |
2021-10-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-09-29 | House | Hanes intended to vote "Yea" |
2021-09-29 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-09-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 6 |
2021-09-29 | House | Ledbetter motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 5 |
2021-09-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-09-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-09-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |