AL HB5 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, check-off contribution to State Park Division of the Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources, Dept. of Mental Health or the Alabama Medicaid Agency, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, check-off contribution to State Park Division of the Dept. of Conservation and Natural Resources, Dept. of Mental Health or the Alabama Medicaid Agency, Sec. 40-18-140 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Hanes motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Livingston motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-398.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseHanes motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1018
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1246
2017-05-17SenateLivingston motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1245
2017-05-17SenateGovernmental Affairs Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-03-14SenateReported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable with 1 amendment
2017-03-07SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2017-03-02HouseEngrossed
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 125
2017-03-02HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 124
2017-03-02HouseHanes Amendment Offered
2017-03-02HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB5&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB5-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB5-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB5-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/182985-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/184008-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561466&VOTE=124&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=561467&VOTE=125&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577929&VOTE=1245&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577930&VOTE=1246&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578884&VOTE=1018&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback