AL HB5 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-25 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Wireless communications providers, location information of customer required upon request of law enforcement on certain circumstances, Kelsey Smith Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wireless communications providers, location information of customer required upon request of law enforcement on certain circumstances, Kelsey Smith Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 73 Abs: 12) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-25SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 65
2016-08-25SenateLost in second house
2016-08-24SenateDial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2016-08-24SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2016-08-19SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-17SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2016-08-17HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 5
2016-08-17HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-08-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-08-15HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback