AL HB5 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Animals, criminal penalties for the purchase or sale of domestic animals or fowl between sunrise and sunset, repealed, Sec. 3-1-20 repealed
Title
Animals, criminal penalties for the purchase or sale of domestic animals or fowl between sunrise and sunset, repealed, Sec. 3-1-20 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 19 Favorable from Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 264 |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |