AL HB5 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Firefighters, death or disability benefits for occupational diseases, established, special procedure for cancer, heart disease, hypertension, or respiratory disease

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firefighters, death or disability benefits for occupational diseases, established, special procedure for cancer, heart disease, hypertension, or respiratory disease

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - Senate - Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - House - Jones motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Brooks motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Conference Committee on HB5 2012RS first Substitute Offered
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-559.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Concurred in Conference Report
2012-05-16 Dial motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1566
2012-05-16 Conference Report Concurrence Requested
2012-05-16 Jones motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1588
2012-05-16 Conference Report
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Appointed
2012-05-16 Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1456 P&PO appoints Brooks, Ward and Smitherman P&PO appoints Brooks, Ward and Smitherman
2012-05-16 Conference Committee Requested
2012-05-16 Jones motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1540 House appoints Jones, Merrill and Grimsley
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1336
2012-05-10 Brooks motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1335
2012-05-10 Brooks first Substitute Offered
2012-05-10 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-10 Brooks Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted
2012-05-10 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2012-03-20 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-15 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2012-03-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 352
2012-03-14 Third Reading Passed
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB5
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB5-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB5-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=430997&VOTE=352&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448719&VOTE=1335&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448720&VOTE=1336&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449707&VOTE=1540&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450215&VOTE=1456&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450495&VOTE=1588&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451004&VOTE=1566&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback