AL HB498 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Education Policy second Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Colleges and universities, require public colleges and universities to enact policies protecting freedom of speech on campus

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colleges and universities, require public colleges and universities to enact policies protecting freedom of speech on campus

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Fridy motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 73 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 62 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Fridy motion to Table (Y: 73 N: 10 NV: 12 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseEducation Policy second Amendment Offered
2019-05-31HouseEngrossed
2019-05-31HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
2019-05-31HouseEducation Policy first Amendment Offered
2019-05-31HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-396.
2019-05-31HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled
2019-05-31SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-30HouseFridy motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1237
2019-05-30HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1373
2019-05-30SenateSmitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1372
2019-05-30SenateSmitherman Amendment Offered
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2019-05-22HouseEngrossed
2019-05-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 876
2019-05-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 875
2019-05-22HouseFridy Substitute Offered
2019-05-22HouseFridy motion to Table adopted Roll Call 874
2019-05-22HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2019-05-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-05-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2019-04-23HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB498&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB498-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/200611-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201607-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202324-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=621951&VOTE=874&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=622083&VOTE=875&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=622086&VOTE=876&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626700&VOTE=1372&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626701&VOTE=1373&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=626773&VOTE=1237&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback