AL HB497 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crenshaw Co., sales tax, co. commission authorized to levy additional tax for certain time period, distrib. for volunteer fire departments and public safety, referendum
Title
Crenshaw Co., sales tax, co. commission authorized to levy additional tax for certain time period, distrib. for volunteer fire departments and public safety, referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Dial motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Dial motion to Miscellaneous (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 58 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-344. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1126 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Dial motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 955 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 531 |
2013-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |