AL HB497 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Workers' compensation, sports officials to qualify as independent contractors, exempt from workers' compensation coverage, Sec. 25-5-50 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation, sports officials to qualify as independent contractors, exempt from workers' compensation coverage, Sec. 25-5-50 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1578
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-03 Lee intended to vote "Yea"
2012-05-03 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2012-05-03 Engrossed
2012-05-03 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1226
2012-05-03 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1225
2012-05-03 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1224
2012-05-03 Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
2012-05-03 Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
2012-05-03 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-22 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2012-03-08 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB497
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB497-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB497-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB497-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444602&VOTE=1224&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444603&VOTE=1225&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=444604&VOTE=1226&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=451050&VOTE=1578&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback