AL HB496 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homicide, crime of homicide by vehicle or vessel, created, penalties, Marshall James Walton Highway Safety Act
Title
Homicide, crime of homicide by vehicle or vessel, created, penalties, Marshall James Walton Highway Safety Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-04-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |