AL HB494 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pretrial Diversion Programs, district attorneys authorized to establish discretionary pretrial diversion programs, basic operating standards provided for, fees distrib., formation of Citizens Justice Advisory Board for Pretrial Diversion authorized, database of pretrial diversion offender by Office of Prosecution Services, required
Title
Pretrial Diversion Programs, district attorneys authorized to establish discretionary pretrial diversion programs, basic operating standards provided for, fees distrib., formation of Citizens Justice Advisory Board for Pretrial Diversion authorized, database of pretrial diversion offender by Office of Prosecution Services, required
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - Senate - Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-361. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1073 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 997 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-25 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 951 |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 950 |
2013-04-25 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 949 |
2013-04-25 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |