AL HB493 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Delivered to Governor on April 26, 2012 at 3:20 p. m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-26 - Delivered to Governor on April 26, 2012 at 3:20 p. m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Abortions, ectopic pregnancies excluded from definition of "abortion" when used in Code of Alabama 1975 and the Alabama Administrative Code, certain requirements relating to probable post-fertilization age clarified
Title
Abortions, ectopic pregnancies excluded from definition of "abortion" when used in Code of Alabama 1975 and the Alabama Administrative Code, certain requirements relating to probable post-fertilization age clarified
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Delivered to Governor on April 26, 2012 at 3:20 p. m. | |
2012-04-26 | Assigned Act No. 2012-261. | |
2012-04-26 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-26 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-26 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 789 | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863 | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |